NH HB394 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 167; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 167; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to crop theft.
Title
Relative to crop theft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 167; Eff: 01/01/2020 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0879h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 99 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0879h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 99 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0879h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 24 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 5 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 12 |