NH HB392 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 12-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 12-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political contributions and expenditures and relative to reporting by political committees.
Title
Relative to political contributions and expenditures and relative to reporting by political committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 12-0) |
2014-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-01-08 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-10-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-09-24 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/3/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-08-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-08-06 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308==RECESSED== |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.194 |