NH HB388 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/19/2012; Effective 01/01/2013; Chapter 0270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/19/2012; Effective 01/01/2013; Chapter 0270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring providers of Voice over Internet Protocol services to pay surcharges for deposit in the enhanced 911 system fund.
Title
Requiring providers of Voice over Internet Protocol services to pay surcharges for deposit in the enhanced 911 system fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-11 - House - OTP/AM 2773H(NT) (Y: 214 N: 140 NV: 15 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | House Signed By Governor 06/19/2012; Effective 01/01/2013; Chapter 0270 | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2447c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2595 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2447c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-31 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2012-2447c; Senate Amendment, Filed | |
2012-05-25 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/30/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Odell, Lambert, and Merrill | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Odell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps J.Garrity, Holden, Cataldo, and Parison; House Journal 44, PG.2348 | |
2012-05-16 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1741s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep J.Garrity): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.2348 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1741s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.471 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Committee Amendment 1741s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.437 | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1741s, New Title, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Hearing: 3/29/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7, Pg.185 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0907h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1331 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0907h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1331-1332 | |
2012-02-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0907h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.972-973 | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0907h(NT) for Mar 7 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1078 | |
2012-02-13 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-02-09 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2012 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-18 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/9/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-17 | House Public Hearing: 2/7/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-11 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 9, PG.542 | |
2012-01-11 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2773h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-140; House Journal 9, PG.538-542 | |
2012-01-11 | House Amendment #2773h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.538-540 | |
2011-10-27 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2773h (New Title); House Calendar 69, PG.2130-2131 | |
2011-10-27 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2773h(NT) for Jan 4 (Vote 7-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2224 | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/13/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301-303 | |
2011-03-02 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-02-22 | House ==RECONVENE== Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-02-15 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Science, Technology & Energy; House Journal 11, PG. 184 |