NH HB387 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-140; House Journal 20, PG. 535-537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to motor vehicle inspections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to motor vehicle inspections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-18 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 207 N: 140 NV: 50 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-18HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-140; House Journal 20, PG. 535-537
2015-02-12HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 251
2015-02-04HouseExecutive Session: 2/10/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2015-01-21House==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 221

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback