NH HB383 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a bridge in the city of Keene.
Title
Naming a bridge in the city of Keene.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/09/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 6 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 12 |