NH HB383 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Sen. Sanborn moved to Rerefer to Committee, Div. 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Sen. Sanborn moved to Rerefer to Committee, Div. 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the immunization/vaccination registry.
Title
Relative to the immunization/vaccination registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn moved to Rerefer to Committee, Div. 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Withdrew Motion to Table; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2015-2045s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Stiles moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Div. 8Y-15N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 6/4/15; Senate Calendar 24 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/21/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0724h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 790-791 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0724h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 790-791 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0724h for Mar 11 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 402 |
2015-03-03 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2015 10:30 OR IMMEDIATELY FOLLOWING SUBCOMMITTEE Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 219 |