NH HB381 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB381
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the system benefits charge.
Title
Relative to the system benefits charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB381 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36