NH HB381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB381
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing requirements for transfer of appropriations in Carroll county.
Title
Repealing requirements for transfer of appropriations in Carroll county.
Sponsors
Rep. Edith DesMarais [D] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Rep. Susan Ticehurst [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Harrison Kanzler [D] | Rep. John MacDonald [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 194 N: 141 NV: 41 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-141 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 56 |
2019-02-28 | House | Special Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2019-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 32 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB381 (Carry Over) 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar