NH HB381 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to cruelty to non-captive wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cruelty to non-captive wildlife.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-02-16HouseLay on Table (Rep. Vaillancourt): Motion Adopted DV 239-130 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 11
2017-02-15HouseSpecial Order to 2/16/2017 (Rep. Rogers): Motion Adopted DV 200-128 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 53
2017-02-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-02-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 26
2017-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2017-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 3 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback