NH HB381 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 169; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 169; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a liquor manufacturer to be issued an on-premises license.
Title
Allowing a liquor manufacturer to be issued an on-premises license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 169; Effective Date 8/25/2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG. 1989 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/4/2015); Senate Journal 18 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/9/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 100, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 772 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 392 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 219 |