NH HB381 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing net metering for micro-combined heat and power systems.
Title
Authorizing net metering for micro-combined heat and power systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0168 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2120e Adopted; Senate Journal 20, Pg.546 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-2120e Adopted; House Journal 48, PG.1670 | |
2011-05-18 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1660s (Rep J.Garrity): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1532 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1660s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.302 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment 1660s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.302 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1660s, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Hearing: 4/14/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0740h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.738-739 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0740h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.738-739 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0740h; House Calendar 23, PG.610 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0740h for Mar 15 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.540 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/10/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-03-01 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-15 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Science, Technology & Energy; House Journal 11, PG. 184 |