NH HB379 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB379
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring notice be provided to tenants during residential eviction proceedings regarding legal counsel.
Title
Requiring notice be provided to tenants during residential eviction proceedings regarding legal counsel.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Christine Seibert [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] | Rep. Kathy Staub [D] |
Rep. Eric Gallager [D] | Rep. Daniel Veilleux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/18/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/27/2023, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced 03/30/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 2 |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/21/2023 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-03-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-02-23 | House | Division Work Session: 03/03/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Finance 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0347h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 11 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2023-0347h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 11 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0347h (NT) 02/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB379 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15