NH HB376 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 15-10; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 15-10; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriating funds to the department of environmental services for the purpose of funding eligible and completed drinking water, wastewater, and landfill closure projects under the state aid grant program.
Title
Appropriating funds to the department of environmental services for the purpose of funding eligible and completed drinking water, wastewater, and landfill closure projects under the state aid grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 15-10; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 22 |
2015-10-16 | House | Executive Session: 11/4/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-10-07 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-03-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-01-28 | House | Division I Work Session: 2/3/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 12, PG. 220 |