NH HB373 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Sen. Cataldo Moved Laid on Table, Div. 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Sen. Cataldo Moved Laid on Table, Div. 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a right of discovery to a carrier's investigation of claims in workers' compensation cases.
Title
Establishing a right of discovery to a carrier's investigation of claims in workers' compensation cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Cataldo Moved Laid on Table, Div. 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/30/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0569h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.761-762 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0569h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.761-762 |
2013-02-28 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0569h; House Calendar 22, PG.545 |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0569h for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.508 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.193 |