NH HB372 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain private employers under workers' compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain private employers under workers' compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 6 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 19-20
2015-09-30HouseExecutive Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-09-14HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-02-12HouseRetained in Committee
2015-01-28HouseExecutive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-01-21House==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 12, PG. 220

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback