NH HB372 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding cigar blunt wraps to the definition of drug paraphernalia in the controlled drug act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding cigar blunt wraps to the definition of drug paraphernalia in the controlled drug act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-02 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.672
2011-02-22 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 2 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.386
2011-02-16 House Executive Session: 2/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-01 House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 184

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback