NH HB371 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.329
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.329
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the statute recognizing cohabitation as a basis for legal marriage.
Title
Repealing the statute recognizing cohabitation as a basis for legal marriage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.329 |
2013-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.209 |
2013-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.193 |