NH HB370 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the election of electors of the president and vice-president of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the election of electors of the president and vice-president of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 11
2021-03-29HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 8
2021-03-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/99327579520
2021-03-03House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:10 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary)
2021-02-17HousePublic Hearing: 02/17/2021 11:15 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/95842759377Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback