NH HB370 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to membership on city and town planning boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to membership on city and town planning boards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-03SenateHearing: 04/10/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 16
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0666h: Amendment Failed Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 16
2019-03-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0666h
2019-03-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 30
2019-02-15House==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback