NH HB370 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Reconsider HB 370 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-171 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Reconsider HB 370 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-171 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation for the purpose of meeting new federal regulations relative to child care.
Title
Making an appropriation for the purpose of meeting new federal regulations relative to child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - Reconsider (Y: 168 N: 171 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - ITL (Y: 168 N: 166 NV: 31 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - ITL (Y: 168 N: 166 NV: 31 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Reconsider HB 370 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-171 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 119 |
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 168-166 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 116 |
2017-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 15-11; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-01 | House | Division III Work Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-25 | House | Division III Work Session: 02/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Finance House Journal 3 P. 10 |