NH HB368 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to third party review required by the planning board.
Title
Relative to third party review required by the planning board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 503 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 242 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 220 |