NH HB366 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain noncompete clauses and nondisclosure agreements regarding free software projects and the sharing of open source software.
Title
Prohibiting certain noncompete clauses and nondisclosure agreements regarding free software projects and the sharing of open source software.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 4 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB366 01/18/2023 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 13 |