NH HB366 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2223h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2223h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to showing a ballot.
Title
Relative to showing a ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2223h for Jan 8 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/6/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-07-23 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/1/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/19/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.193 |