NH HB365 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 248-132 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to net energy metering limits for customer generators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to net energy metering limits for customer generators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 248 N: 132 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 254 N: 98 NV: 18 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseVeto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 248-132 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
2019-05-02HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1554s (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 2
2019-06-04HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 06/03/2019
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-10HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1871e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100
2019-05-08SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1871e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16
2019-04-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1554s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-18SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1554s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1487s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1487s, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced 03/27/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0973h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-98 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 26
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0973h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 26
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0973h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 33
2019-03-06House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-27House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback