NH HB365 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Reconsider HB 365 (Rep. McNally): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-172 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to awarding attorney's fees under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to awarding attorney's fees under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - House - Reconsider (Y: 168 N: 172 NV: 22 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - ITL (Y: 207 N: 166 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - OTP (Y: 184 N: 187 NV: 11 Abs: 14) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08HouseReconsider HB 365 (Rep. McNally): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-172 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 2
2017-02-16HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-166 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 14
2017-02-16HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 184-187 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 11
2017-02-16HouseSpecial Order to 2/16/2017 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 57
2017-02-09HouseSpecial Order to regular calendar on 2/15/2017 (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 20
2017-02-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/09/2017 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 10
2017-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/26/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback