NH HB364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1613s, and 2019-1783s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use and permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to donate excess cannabis to other qualifying patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use and permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to donate excess cannabis to other qualifying patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1613s, and 2019-1783s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-05-02SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-1783s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1613s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1613s, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-20SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0689h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 40
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0689h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 40
2019-02-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-27HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0689h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 12
2019-02-20House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-31HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-01-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback