NH HB361 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 138; Effective Date 6/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the definition of "employee" and the application of that definition to persons who work exclusively at home via the Internet for online business activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the definition of "employee" and the application of that definition to persons who work exclusively at home via the Internet for online business activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-16HouseSigned by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 138; Effective Date 6/12/2015
2015-05-21HouseEnrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782
2015-05-21SenateEnrolled (In recess 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16
2015-05-19HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1726EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1780
2015-05-14SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #1726e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15
2015-05-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13
2015-04-29SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20
2015-04-02SenateHearing: 4/7/15, Room 100, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16
2015-03-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0132h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 795-796
2015-03-11HouseAmendment #0132h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 795-796
2015-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0132h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 404
2015-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-20House==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 219

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback