NH HB360 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act legalizing cannabis for persons 21 years of age or older.
Title
An act legalizing cannabis for persons 21 years of age or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/18/2023; Senate Calendar 22 |
2023-04-18 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 31 |
2023-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 160-210 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 31 |
2023-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB360-FN 02/17/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 10 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 01:30 pm State House Reps Hall |