NH HB359 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2222s (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to warning labels on prescription drugs containing opiates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to warning labels on prescription drugs containing opiates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2222s (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2222s, Regular Calendar 22Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-2222s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Feltes Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1855s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to after Executive Departments and Administration, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1855s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-03-20SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0344h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0344h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
2019-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0344h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7
2019-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 46

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback