NH HB359 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to returning a percentage of the LCHIP fee to the municipality where the real estate transfer from which the fee originates is located.
Title
Relative to returning a percentage of the LCHIP fee to the municipality where the real estate transfer from which the fee originates is located.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Chirichiello [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. James Webb [R] |
Rep. Martin Bove [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. Martin Bove [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/09/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 8 |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2017 11:20 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 10 |