NH HB359 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing all municipalities to adopt the property tax exemption to foster commercial and industrial construction.
Title
Allowing all municipalities to adopt the property tax exemption to foster commercial and industrial construction.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank McCarthy [R] | Rep. Thomas Buco [D] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Lino Avellani [R] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 03/01/2016, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2408h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/20/2016 House Journal 8 P. 16 |
2016-01-20 | House | Amendment #2015-2408h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/20/2016 House Journal 8 P. 16 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2408h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 28 |
2015-09-23 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-16 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-25 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means. |