NH HB359 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2408h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2408h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing municipalities in Carroll county to offer property tax exemptions to foster commercial and industrial construction.
Title
Allowing municipalities in Carroll county to offer property tax exemptions to foster commercial and industrial construction.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank McCarthy [R] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Rep. Lino Avellani [R] | Rep. Thomas Buco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2408h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 28 |
2015-09-23 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-16 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-25 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means. |