NH HB356 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 205; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2021 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/6/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 205; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2021 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/6/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study cryptocurrency regulation.
Title
Establishing a commission to study cryptocurrency regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 205; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2021 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/6/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 29 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1987e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 27 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1987e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1396s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 2 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1396s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1396s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1396s, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2534h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 31 |
2016-01-07 | House | Amendment #2015-2534h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 31 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2534h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-09-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2015 2:05 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 219 |