NH HB356 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2534h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2534h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting persons using private virtual currencies for internet commerce from the licensing requirements for money transmitters.
Title
Exempting persons using private virtual currencies for internet commerce from the licensing requirements for money transmitters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2534h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-09-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2015 2:05 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 219 |