NH HB356 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of the state transferring insurance under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of the state transferring insurance under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.739 |
2013-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.500 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.192 |