NH HB355 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB355
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2846h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2846h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulation by the New Hampshire real estate commission.
Title
Relative to regulation by the New Hampshire real estate commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2846h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-23 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-09-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB355 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2846h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)