NH HB354 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 13; Eff: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 13; Eff: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the local option for sports betting.
Title
Relative to the local option for sports betting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 13; Eff: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 99 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/22/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 21 |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 14 |
2021-02-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99928276230 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95843569442 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 44 |