NH HB350 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB350
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-128 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-128 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ranked-choice voting.
Title
Relative to ranked-choice voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Joan Hamblet [D] | Rep. David Meuse [D] | Rep. Laura Telerski [D] |
Rep. Eamon Kelley [D] | Rep. Connie Lane [D] | Rep. Daniel Veilleux [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] |
Rep. Brandon Phinney [L] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-03 - House - ITL (Y: 248 N: 128 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-128 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 120 |
2023-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB350 10/31/2023 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 33 |
2023-10-17 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 House Calendar 42 |
2023-01-26 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB350 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Retained in Committee