NH HB350 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-144 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting possession of a firearm at a polling place.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting possession of a firearm at a polling place.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - House - ITL (Y: 204 N: 144 NV: 21 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-144 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 23
2017-02-10HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-02-10HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17
2017-02-01HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 9

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback