NH HB349 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 229-155 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 229-155 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a second opinion on health care matters for state and county prisoners.
Title
Relative to a second opinion on health care matters for state and county prisoners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 229 N: 155 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - OTP (Y: 226 N: 145 NV: 4 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - OTP (Y: 226 N: 145 NV: 4 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 229-155 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 24 |
2019-07-16 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2328s (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2328s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2328s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2328s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 103, State House, 03:10 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-145 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 10 |
2019-01-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-01-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6 |
2019-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-02 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 46 |