NH HB349 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 134; Eff. 1/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to out-of-home placements under the child protection act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to out-of-home placements under the child protection act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 134; Eff. 1/1/2018
2017-06-01HouseEnrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127
2017-06-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19
2017-05-18HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1618s (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 2
2017-05-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1618s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1618s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1618s, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2017-03-21SenateHearing: 03/28/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0658h: Motion Adopted DV 186-158 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 53
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0658h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 53
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0658h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-22House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-02-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 9

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback