NH HB349 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state buffers for projects requiring wetland permits.
Title
Relative to state buffers for projects requiring wetland permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] |
Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep C. Christiensen): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1258 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 434 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2015-01-29 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2015-01-22 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG. 218 |