NH HB348 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of raw milk and products made with raw milk.
Title
Relative to the sale of raw milk and products made with raw milk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB348-FN 02/28/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 5 |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 12 |