NH HB348 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to procedures for condominiums with 25 or fewer residential units.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to procedures for condominiums with 25 or fewer residential units.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-05-30SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-17SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 5
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 46

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback