NH HB348 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing municipalities to adopt a property tax credit for elderly homeowners for the extent their tax bill exceeds 10 percent of income.
Title
Allowing municipalities to adopt a property tax credit for elderly homeowners for the extent their tax bill exceeds 10 percent of income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 565 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 349-350 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 218 |