NH HB347 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB347
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-12 - Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-12 - Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a superior court land use review docket.
Title
Establishing a superior court land use review docket.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Lynn [R] | Rep. Bill Boyd [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] |
Rep. Mark McLean [R] | Rep. Ben Ming [D] | Rep. Benjamin Baroody [D] | Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] |
Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Jason Osborne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | House | Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37 |
2023-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-02-23 | House | Division Work Session: 03/03/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-16 | House | Division Work Session: 02/21/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Finance 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0117h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2023-0117h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-02-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0117h 02/01/2023 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 12 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Carry Over) 2023-09-12 - Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37