NH HB347 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to driving with a suspended license.
Title
Relative to driving with a suspended license.
Sponsors
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/13/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/27/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 36 |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92387218591 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 44 |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Carry Over) 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15