NH HB347 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 168; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 168; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment of wages of certain hourly school district employees.
Title
Relative to payment of wages of certain hourly school district employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 168; Effective Date 8/25/2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1993 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1393s (Rep Infantine): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1813 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1393s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1393s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1393s, 5/14/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Order HB 347 to 5/14/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1393s, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/21/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0426h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 795 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0426h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 795 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0426h for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 404 |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 218 |