NH HB346 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB346
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to the funding source for the domestic violence programs fund.
Title
Relative to the funding source for the domestic violence programs fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB346-Fn 09/07/2021 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 18 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98448475898 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 44 |
Same As/Similar To
HB346 (Carry Over) 2021-08-18 - ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=250&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB346 |