NH HB346 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB346
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to noncompete agreements.
Title
Relative to noncompete agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB346 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)